Dogfen lywodraethu Southampton Forward

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 AUGUST 2010 as amended on 26 Aug 2020 as amended on 19 Oct 2020 as amended on 17 May 2021 as amended on 23 Apr 2025 as amended on 18 Feb 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
Objects 4. The charity’s objects (“Objects”) are specifically restricted to the following:- To further such charitable purposes for the benefit of the people in the City of Southampton and or the South of England as the trustees/directors see fit from time to time, in particular but without limitation to the foregoing by: (1) advancing public education, enjoyment and access for all to cultural activities in the City of Southampton and/or the South of England, as a key contribution to wellbeing and inclusive economic growth; (2) supporting, encouraging and promoting cultural and artistic excellence in the development of literary, dramatic and artistic material (including supporting and promoting festivals of the arts); (3) conserving and enhancing the historic and natural heritage of the City of Southampton and/or the South of England; (4) providing recreational facilities for the public at large or those by reason of economic circumstances, have need of such facilities; (5) providing financial and/or technical assistance or business advice or consultancy in order to provide training and employment opportunities for unemployed people in case of financial or other charitable need through help: (i) in setting up their own business; or (ii) to existing business; (6) promoting sustainable development for the benefit of the public by: (i) the preservation, conservation and protection of the environment and the prudent use of natural resources; (ii) the relief of poverty and improvement of the conditions of life in socially and economically disadvantaged communities; (iii) the promotion of sustainable means of achieving economic growth and regeneration (7) advancing the education of the public in subjects related to sustainable development and the protection, enhancement and rehabilitation of the environment and to promote the study and research in such subjects provided the useful results of such study are disseminated to the public at large. For the purpose of this article 4 “sustainable development” means “development that meets the needs of the present without compromising the ability of future generations to meet their own needs”. (8) developing the capacity and skills of the members of the socially and economically disadvantaged community of the City of Southampton and/or the South of England in such a way that they are better able to identify, and help meet, their needs and to participate more fully in society (9) promoting for the benefit of the public of urban regeneration in areas of social economic deprivation in the City of Southampton and/or the South of England by all or any of the following means: (i) the advancement of education, training or retraining, particularly among unemployed people, and providing unemployed people with work experience; (ii) the creation of trading and employment opportunities by the provision of workspace, buildings, and / or land for use on favourable terms; (iii) the maintenance ,improvement or provision of public amenities; (iv) the protection or conservation of the environment; and (v) such other means as may from time to time be determined subject to the prior written consent of the Charity Commission for England and Wales. (10) promoting social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society. For the purpose of this article 4 “socially excluded” means being excluded from society, or parts of society, as a result of one or more of the following factors unemployment; financial hardship; youth or old age, ill health (physical or menta), sustenance abuse or dependency including alcohol and drugs, discrimination on the grounds of sex, race, ability, ethnic origin, religion, belief, creed, sexual orientation or gender re-assignment; poor educational or skills attainment, relationship and / or family breakdown, poor housing (that is housing that does not meet basic habitable standards), crime (either as a victim or as an offender rehabilitating into society). Nothing in the articles shall authorise an application of the property of the charity for the purposes which are not charitable.
Maes buddion
CITY OF SOUTHAMPTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.