Dogfen lywodraethu LLOYD'S REGISTER FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 APR 2017 as amended on 29 Jun 2021 as amended on 28 Sep 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO SECURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY HIGH TECHNICAL STANDARDS OF DESIGN, MANUFACTURE, CONSTRUCTION, MAINTENANCE, OPERATION AND PERFORMANCE FOR THE PURPOSE OF ENHANCING THE SAFETY OF LIFE AND PROPERTY AT SEA AND ON LAND AND IN THE AIR; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION INCLUDING WITHIN THE TRANSPORTATION INDUSTRIES AND ANY OTHER ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGICAL DISCIPLINES.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.