KINO KLASSIKA FOUNDATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To raise funds to support the publication of a book of Sergei Eisenstein drawings in partnership with RGALI, the State Archive of the Russian Federation, an Eisenstein program in London, an exhibition of drawings, screenings of Eisenstein's films inc a film concert of Eisenstein's October with the LSO, an academic conference of Eisenstein's legacy and preparation of film seasons generally.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Dinas Westminster
Llywodraethu
- 13 Chwefror 2013: Cofrestrwyd
- 18 Gorffennaf 2023: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- KINO KLASSIKA (Enw gwaith)
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli risg
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £83.64k | £40.64k | £37.77k | £60.82k | £62.87k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £88.31k | £35.76k | £44.36k | £47.46k | £78.11k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £4.20k | £35.70k | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 31 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 03 Ebrill 2023 | 62 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 25 Chwefror 2022 | 25 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 25 Chwefror 2022 | 25 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 31 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 31 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/02/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND PROTECTION OF CLASSIC FILMS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FROM THE COUNTRIES OF THE FORMER SOVIET UNION, AS ARE OF HISTORIC, CULTURAL OR ARTISTIC INTEREST. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO CLASSIC FILMS FROM THE COUNTRIES OF THE FORMER SOVIET UNION AND THE CULTURE IN WHICH THEY WERE PRODUCED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESENTATION OF SUCH FILMS TO THE PUBLIC AND PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR ARTISTIC PROJECTS GENERATED BY ENGAGEMENT WITH THESE FILMS AND THEIR SUPPORTING CULTURE. (3) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window