Dogfen lywodraethu WIMBLEDON AND DISTRICT SYNAGOGUE

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 NOV 2016 as amended on 10 Apr 2019 as amended on 24 Nov 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE SYNAGOGUE ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE PRACTICE, PROMOTION, DEVELOPMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF JUDAISM THROUGH PUBLIC WORSHIP, RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL, SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.