THE CENTRE FOR ADOPTION SUPPORT AND EDUCATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Centre for Adoption Support and Education's purpose is to provide tailored and specific high quality, innovative services, activities and resources that support and make a difference to those affected by adoption and permanency: adopted or fostered children and families and professionals who work with adoption and permanence.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Caerfaddon A Gogledd Ddwyrain Gwlad Yr Haf
- De Swydd Gaerloyw
- Dinas Bryste
- Gogledd Gwlad Yr Haf
- Gwlad Yr Haf
- Swindon
- Swydd Gaerloyw
- Wiltshire
Llywodraethu
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £63.34k | £85.54k | £235.12k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £52.54k | £79.77k | £202.43k | £60.80k | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £16.32k | £118.91k | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 11 Tachwedd 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 17 Rhagfyr 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 07 Rhagfyr 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 07 Rhagfyr 2018 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 08 Tachwedd 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 08 Tachwedd 2017 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/08/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE OR MAY BE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PART OF SOCIETY BY REASON OF BEING ADOPTED, FOSTERED OR PLACED IN CARE. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE OR MAY BE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PART OF SOCIETY BY REASON OF COMING FROM BROKEN OR DAMAGED HOMES AND HAVE BEEN OR MAY BE ADOPTED, FOSTERED OR PLACED IN CARE BY: A) PROMOTING THE RELIEF AND CARE OF CHILDREN WITHOUT FAMILIES OR PARENTS ABLE TO MEET THEIR NEEDS WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE AND FUTURE OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. B) PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO ADOPTIVE PARENTS, CARERS, GUARDIANS AND PROFESSIONALS ABOUT ALL ADOPTION RELATED ISSUES C) ALLEVIATING THE EFFECTS OF EARLY LIFE TRAUMA AND BEREAVEMENTS ON ADOPTED, FOSTERED OR CHILD IN CARE D) ENCOURAGING HEALTHY ATTACHMENTS AND FAMILY BONDING IN ADOPTIVE AND FOSTER FAMILIES E) PROMOTING GREATER EDUCATION AND SOCIAL INCLUSION OF ADOPTED, FOSTERED AND CHILDREN IN CARE SO THEY ACHIEVE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL F) PROVIDING GUIDANCE SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING TO ADOPTED CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES WITH THE AIM OF RELIEVING DISTRESS RESULTING FROM THE IMPACT OF ADOPTION ON THEIR LIVES. 3. TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING ADVICE, SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO: A) CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE, HAVE BEEN, ADOPTED, FOSTERED OR PLACED IN CARE; B) INDIVIDUALS OF ANY AGE WHO WERE ADOPTED, FOSTERED OR IN CARE; AND C) ADOPTIVE PARENTS, FOSTER CARERS, OR MEMBERS OF FAMILIES WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN INVOLVED IN PROVIDING ADOPTIVE OR FOSTER FAMILIES. 4. TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY CHAMPIONING BEST PRACTICE IN RELATION TO THE PROVISION OF ADOPTION, FOSTERING OR CARE SERVICES AND BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO ALL THOSE WHO MAY BE INVOLVED IN THE ADOPTION, FOSTERING AND CARE PROCESS INCLUDING: A) LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND CHILDREN’S (AND OTHER) CHARITIES ACTIVE IN THIS AREA; B) SOCIAL WORKERS AND OTHER PROFESSIONALS WORKING IN THE AREAS OF CHILD CARE AND SOCIAL INCLUSION; C) FAMILIES WHO ARE CONSIDERING OR HAVE ADOPTED OR FOSTERED; AND D) INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME BEEN ADOPTED, FOSTERED OR PLACED IN CARE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window