Dogfen lywodraethu BERKSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 03 JAN 2014 AMENDED ON 08/10/2015 AMENDED ON 10/12/2015 as amended on 13 Jul 2018 as amended on 13 Jul 2018 as amended on 02 Oct 2018 as amended on 10 Mar 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE ROYAL COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM,IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION,THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH,BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL,AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS;AND 3.2 OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE ROYAL COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.