ROCK FIRE RAIN

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The company's principal activity during the year continued to be internet evangelism and local outreach meetings.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 29 February 2024
Pobl

3 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Seland Newydd
Llywodraethu
- 07 Gorffennaf 2014: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
3 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE ESTELLE HENSHALL MA FIA | Cadeirydd | 07 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN MICHAEL DAY | Ymddiriedolwr | 07 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR WILLIAM STEPHEN MUGFORD | Ymddiriedolwr | 07 February 2014 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £3.30k | £290 | £750 | £500 | £9.50k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £3.60k | £451 | £509 | £513 | £9.37k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 29 Chwefror 2024 | 18 Medi 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 29 Chwefror 2024 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 28 Chwefror 2023 | 20 Rhagfyr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 28 Chwefror 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 28 Chwefror 2022 | 22 Hydref 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 28 Chwefror 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 28 Chwefror 2021 | 11 Medi 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 28 Chwefror 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 29 Chwefror 2020 | 12 Medi 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 29 Chwefror 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/06/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING BELOW IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED “THE TRUSTEES”) MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. STATEMENT OF BELIEFS 4.1.1.1 THERE IS ONLY ON TRUE GOD WHO IS THE ETERNAL KING, CREATOR AND REDEEMER OF ALL THAT IS. HE IS ONE BEING IN THREE PERSONS: GOD THE FATHER, GOD THE SON AND GOD THE HOLY SPIRIT. 4.1.1.2 THERE IS ONE LORD JESUS CHRIST, THE ONLY SON OF GOD, ETERNALLY BEGOTTEN OF THE FATHER, GOD FROM GOD, LIGHT FROM LIGHT, TRUE GOD FROM TRUE GOD, BEGOTTEN, NOT MADE, OF ONE BEING WITH THE FATHER; THROUGH HIM ALL THINGS WERE MADE. FOR US AND FOR OUR SALVATION HE CAME DOWN FROM HEAVEN, WAS INCARNATE OF THE HOLY SPIRIT AND THE VIRGIN MARY AND WAS MADE MAN. FOR OUR SAKE HE WAS CRUCIFIED UNDER PONTIUS PILATE; HE SUFFERED DEATH AND WAS BURIED. ON THE THIRD DAY HE ROSE AGAIN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SCRIPTURES; HE ASCENDED INTO HEAVEN AND IS SEATED AT THE RIGHT HAND OF THE FATHER. HE WILL COME AGAIN IN GLORY TO JUDGE THE LIVING AND THE DEAD AND HIS KINGDOM WITH HAVE NO END. 4.1.1.3 THE HOLY SPIRIT, THE LORD, THE GIVER OF LIFE, PROCEEDS FROM THE FATHER AND THE SON AND WITH THE FATHER AND THE SON IS WORSHIPPED AND GLORIFIED. HE HAS SPOKEN THROUGH THE PROPHETS. THE BAPTISM OF THE HOLY SPIRIT ACCORDING TO ACTS 1:4-8 AND 2:4 IS POURED OUT ON CHRISTIANS THAT THEY MIGHT HAVE THE POWER TO BE WITNESSES. 4.1.1.4 THE BIBLE IS THE ONLY DIVINELY INSPIRED AND INFALLIBLE, AUTHORITATIVE WORD OF GOD. 4.1.1.5 HUMANKIND WAS CREATED IN THE IMAGE OF GOD TO KNOW AND ENJOY HIM, YET WE WILFULLY REJECTED THE LORDSHIP AND GLORY OF GOD FOR WHICH WE WERE INTENDED. BECAUSE OF THIS, SICKNESS, DEATH AND JUDGEMENT ENTERED THE WORLD AND NOW CREATION EXPERIENCES THE EFFECTS AND CONSEQUENCES OF SIN. 4.1.1.6 WE ARE SAVED BY GOD?S GRACE, THROUGH FAITH IN THE PERSON AND WORK OF JESUS CHRIST. ANYONE CAN BE RESTORED TO FELLOWSHIP WITH GOD THROUGH REPENTING, BELIEVING AND RECEIVING JESUS AS THEIR SAVIOUR AND LORD. 4.1.1.7 HEAVEN AND HELL ARE REAL PLACES; EACH HUMAN SPIRIT WILL GO TO ONE OR THE OTHER AFTER DEATH. 4.1.1.8 THE VICTORIOUS REDEMPTIVE WORK OF CHRIST ON THE CROSS PROVIDES FREEDOM FROM THE POWER OF THE DEVIL, SIN, SICKNESS AND TORMENT. 4.1.1.9 THE CHURCH CONSISTS OF ALL WHO PUT THEIR FAITH IN JESUS CHRIST. HE GAVE HIS CHURCH THE ORDINANCES OF BAPTISM AND COMMUNION - THERE IS ONE BAPTISM FOR THE FORGIVENESS OF SINS. 4.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
85 Great Portland Street
First Floor
London
W1W 7LT
- Ffôn:
- 07595039912
- E-bost:
- info@rockfirerain.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window