MINISTRY AT WORK
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Ministry at Work exists to advance the Christian faith in the wider business communities. It seeks to encourage, equip and resource people to flourish in mind, body and spirit. Working ecumenically and across all faiths and none the charity seeks to build inter-faith relationships encouraging all to reach their full potential in their working environments.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 May 2023
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Dinas Stoke-on-trent
- Swydd Stafford
Llywodraethu
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £60.52k | £60.77k | £16.08k | £21.51k | £2.92k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £52.19k | £51.81k | £43.42k | £32.09k | £1.34k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2023 | 13 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2023 | 13 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 08 Rhagfyr 2023 | 403 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 08 Rhagfyr 2023 | 403 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 27 Hydref 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 27 Hydref 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 13 Gorffennaf 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 13 Gorffennaf 2020 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 May 2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE APPLICATION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO LIFE IN THE CONTEMPORARY WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF: - SUPPORT TO THE BUSINESS COMMUNITY IN NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS WITH A VIEW TO ENABLING ITS MEMBERS TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AND TO FIND HELP AND ENCOURAGEMENT TO FLOURISH IN MIND, BODY AND SPIRIT; AND - A VIRTUAL AND PHYSICAL PLACE OF CONNECTION AND SPIRITUAL ADVANCEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THAT COMMUNITY AND ITS MEMBERS THROUGH INTER ALIA THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE TO ANY MEMBER OF THAT COMMUNITY IRRESPECTIVE OF RELIGIOUS FAITH, THE ORGANIZING OF MAJOR AND MINOR PRAYER AND OTHER MEETINGS OR GATHERINGS AND THE PRODUCTION AND/OR DISTRIBUTION OF SUPPORTIVE AND ENERGIZING RESOURCES IN ANY MEDIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window