Dogfen lywodraethu BLUE STONE COLLABORATIVE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/12/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16/09/2015 as amended on 08 Apr 2019 as amended on 08 Feb 2021 as amended on 29 Jan 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE, GATESHEAD AND ELSEWHERE, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; (2) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN FINANCIAL NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; (3) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS; (4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; (5) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH; (6) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY - "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY; (7) THE PROMOTION OF AMATEUR SPORTS; (8) THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS; (9) THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; AND (10) THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITABLE AND NON-CHARITABLE BODIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE, GATESHEAD AND ELSEWHERE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.