Dogfen lywodraethu STAFFORDSHIRE WOMEN'S AID GROUP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/09/1975 AS AMENDED ON 30/09/1976 AS AMENDED ON 14/02/2000 AS AMENDED ON 01/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 18/10/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (1) TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND INCREASE THE SAFETY OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE EXPOSED TO DOMESTIC AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE AND ABUSE, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE, TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION AND ANY OTHER SERVICES OR ACTIVITIES WHICH MAY RELIEVE THEIR CIRCUMSTANCES, AND WHERE REQUIRED, WE WILL SUPPORT MEN IN THE SAME SITUATION. (2) TO RELIEVE ANY WOMAN OR CHILD IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WHO MAY BE TEMPORARILY HOMELESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES AND BY THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THEIR MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH IN SUCH WAYS AS SHALL RELIEVE THEIR NEED. (3) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF DOMESTIC AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE AND THE PREVENTION THEREOF AND TO UNDERTAKE OR CONTRIBUTE TO RESEARCH INTO SUCH MATTERS AND / OR PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
STAFFORDSHIRE AND OUTLYING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.