Dogfen lywodraethu GROWING AGAINST VIOLENCE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/04/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/04/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/04/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/08/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: 1) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC; AND 3) TO UNDERTAKE SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, THROUGH ACTIVITIES INCLUDING: - THE PROVISION OF LEARNING PROGRAMMES THAT PROMOTE THE PREVENTION OF VIOLENCE AND CRIME; AND - RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, AND EFFECTS ON SOCIETY IN GENERAL, AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR, OF PEER-ON-PEER VIOLENCE, GANG-RELATED CRIME, AND OTHER CRIME.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.