Dogfen lywodraethu THE NORTHERN COLLEGE FOR RESIDENTIAL ADULT EDUCATION LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 NOV 1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 13 DEC 1990, 28 MAY 1993 (TAKING AFFECT 1 SEPT 1993), 10 JULY 2001, 26 MARCH 2004 AND NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 17 JULY 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/2015 as amended on 18 May 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE ADULT EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION, ORGANISATION AND ARRANGEMENTS OF FULL-TIME OR PART-TIME COURSES OF STUDY OR EDUCATIONAL RESEARCH. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM)
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.