Dogfen lywodraethu THE DURHAM AND NEWCASTLE DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF CHURCH BELL RINGERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 15/04/1978 AS AMENDED ON 25/04/2009 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2010 as amended on 25 Apr 2015 as amended on 23 Apr 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE OF SERVICE TO CHURCHES IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL BOUNDARIES WITHIN THE DIOCESES OF DURHAM & NEWCASTLE BY A) PROMOTING THE RINGING OF BELLS FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP AND ON OTHER APPROPRIATE OCCASIONS B) RECRUITING AND TRAINING RINGERS C) ENCOURAGING THE ART OF CHANGE-RINGING D) HELPING RINGERS TO IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF THEIR RINGING E) THE CARE AND RESTORATION OF BELLS AND THEIR FITTINGS.
Maes buddion
THE DIOCESES OF DURHAM AND NEWCASTLE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.