Dogfen lywodraethu HUMSHAUGH VILLAGE HALL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 21/02/1980 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 03/01/1996 AS AMENDED ON 09/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01/12/2011 as amended on 12 Mar 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
SHALL BE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HUMSHAUGH ANDTHAT PART OF THE PARISH OF WARDEN, IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHUMBERLAND WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
PARISH OF HUMSHAUGH PART OF THE PARISH OF WARDEN
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.