Dogfen lywodraethu SWINDON'S FOOD COLLECTIVE LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 NOV 2018 as amended on 03 Sep 2019 as amended on 24 May 2021 as amended on 20 Aug 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically restricted to the following: the prevention or relief of poverty and to preserve and protect good health by providing food, non-food and non-alcoholic beverages to those in financial need or poor health in the Swindon and District area of Wiltshire. [Nothing in the articles shall authorise an application of the property of the charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005 and/or section 2 of the Charities Act (Northern Ireland) 2008.]
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.