Dogfen lywodraethu The Azure Charitable Foundation

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 SEPTEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 MAY 1984, 29 JULY 1992, 18 JUNE 2003 , 23 JUNE 2004 AND 24 NOVEMBER 2004, 22ND JUNE 2005, 14 JUNE 2006 AND 30 JUNE 2010 as amended on 18 Jul 2024 as amended on 05 Feb 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
4. The charity’s objects (“Objects”) are specifically restricted to the following charitable purposes: (1) To work with people who have special educational needs and/or a disability and/or who are disadvantaged (hereinafter called the “Beneficiaries”) to maximise their quality of life, life chances and personal development; (2) To provide or assist in the provision of all or any of the following services to or for the Beneficiaries; supported housing, employment (including supported employment), education and training, community integration support, counselling and any other relevant support service which may be developed.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.