Dogfen lywodraethu GORDON THOMPSON /MOLLIE NELSON MADDOCK TRUST FUND

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH JUNE 1985 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 7 JULY 1993 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 31 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED ON 04 JUL 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUST FUND SHALL BE USED TO PROVIDE AWARDS TO EXTEND THE HORIZONS AND EXPERIENCES OF PUPILS AND STUDENTS WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF WARRINGTON, THROUGH RESIDENTIAL STUDY AND TRAVEL ARRANGEMENTS OR ANY SCHEME TAKING PUPILS AND STUDENTS WITHIN THE BOROUGH, OUT OF THE HOME AND SCHOOL ENVIRONMENTS FOR LESS THAN OVERNIGHT PERIODS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.