Dogfen lywodraethu HAREWOOD HOUSE TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/03/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/06/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 JAN 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PRESERVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE MANSION HOUSE KNOWN AS HAREWOOD HOUSE IN YORKSHIRE TOGETHER WITH ITS ANCILLARY BUILDINGS, GARDENS, ARBORETA, WOODLANDS AND PARK OR SUCH PARTS THEREOF AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE HELD BY THE COMPANY, AND TO PROMOTE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF HAREWOOD AS A PLACE OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST AND NATURAL BEAUTY. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3A OF THE MEMORANDUM.)
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.