Dogfen lywodraethu DIAL HOUSE CHESTER
Rhif yr elusen: 518908
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 APRIL 1986 AS AMENDED 9 MARCH 1987, 19 OCTOBER 1988, 19 NOVEMBER 1991, 23 JUNE 1997 AND 26 JUNE 2001
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES LIVING IN THE WEST CHESHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREA SO THAT THEY MAY LEAD ACTIVE AND FULFILLING LIVES INTEGRATED IN SOCIETY
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
WEST CHESHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.