Dogfen lywodraethu EAST LANCASHIRE RAILWAY TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/11/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/09/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/06/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/06/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/04/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH SUBJECTS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE INCLUDING:- (I) TECHNICAL MATTERS RELATING TO RAILWAYS, THEIR CONSTRUCTION AND MAINTENANCE, ENGINES, STEAM TRACTION AND ENGINEERING SKILLS, AND (II) THE INDUSTRIAL AND SOCIAL HISTORY OF EAST LANCASHIRE (AND PARTICULARLY OF THE TOWNS AND VILLAGES ON THE RAILWAY FROM CASTLETON, ROCHDALE TO RAWTENSTALL, LANCASHIRE) AND THE IMPORTANCE OF THE RAILWAY IN SUCH HISTORY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.