Dogfen lywodraethu ST MARTINS HOUSING TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/05/1989 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/01/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/04/1995 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28/03/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/04/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE SHELTER AND ACCOMMODATION IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK FOR POOR PERSONS AGED EIGHTEEN AND OVER HAVING NO OTHER RESIDENCE OR PLACE TO SLEEP; TO PROVIDE SOCIAL HOUSING AND ANY OTHER PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH OR INCIDENTAL TO THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF HOUSING, SOCIAL HOUSING AND ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS AGED EIGHTEEN AND OVER; AND TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
CITY OF NORWICH
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.