Dogfen lywodraethu NEW BREWERY ARTS LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/05/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/07/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/12/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/12/2011 as amended on 25 Apr 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
a) To advance the education, appreciation, participation and engagement of the public in relation to the arts, crafts, culture and creativity; b) To enrich the life of all communities by providing facilities, open to the widest possible public access, for education, engagement and recreation in the arts, crafts, culture and creativity; c) To provide cultural, creative and recreational facilities and opportunities to all communities, for the purposes of learning and social well-being.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE CIRENCESTER
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.