Dogfen lywodraethu STROUD VALLEYS PROJECT LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1988 AS AMENDED 23 MAY 1989, 4 APRIL 1995, 26 NOVEMBER 1999 AND 31 JANUARY 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY, INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE STROUD DISTRICT, IN LINE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT AND THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE STROUD DISTRICT, IN LINE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING, WORKING IN OR RESORTING TO THE STROUD DISTRICT IN LINE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT.
Maes buddion
STROUD DISTRICT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.