THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BERWICK HOSPITALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the relief of patients and former patients of the Berwick Hospitals who are sick. To educate the public in the needs of patients and to supplement the service provided by the Berwick Hospitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northumberland
Governance
- 10 August 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs J Guthrie | Chair | 04 September 2013 |
|
|||||
Janet Hall | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Redmond | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Duff | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacynth Hamblett | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dennis Handley | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK LANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARJORIE ALICE READ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA HERDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY WAKENSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY JUNE STEPHENSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.40k | £4.71k | £2.87k | £22.81k | £3.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.96k | £11.65k | £10.45k | £4.49k | £2.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 03 December 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JULY 1990
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITALS AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT DISABLED HANDICAPPED INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITALS
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF BERWICK UPON TWEED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 WALKERGATE
BERWICK UPON TWEED
NORTHUMBERLAND
TD15 1DJ
- Phone:
- 01289306688
- Email:
- ml@gwayre.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window