Financial history WELWYN ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1000079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £31.78k £32.73k £34.32k £34.80k £36.62k
Total expenditure £38.47k £13.20k £42.60k £48.05k £8.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A