Financial history THE TORCHBEARERS TRUST

Charity number: 1000113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £106.82k £75.91k £93.49k £114.78k £70.94k
Total expenditure £103.71k £76.81k £95.02k £122.09k £71.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.75k £4.24k N/A N/A