ST ANTHOLIN'S LECTURESHIP CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual lecture on the Puritans
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 10 September 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MARK EDWARD BURKILL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
REV W T TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Rev LEE GATISS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.08k | £1.11k | £1.14k | £1.18k | £1.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.05k | £250 | £1.05k | £700 | £700 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26TH JUNE 1990
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE DOCTRINES OF THE PURITAN SCHOOL OF DIVINITY BY THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE LECTURES DURING ANY PERIOD OF TWELVE MONTHS TO BE HELD IN THE CITY OF LONDON
Area of benefit
CITY OF LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. HELENS CHURCH
GREAT ST. HELENS
LONDON
EC3A 6AT
- Phone:
- 02072832231
- Email:
- h.tyler@st-helens.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window