FREEDOM FROM TORTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Freedom from Torture is a human rights organisation which exists to enable survivors of torture to engage in a healing process. We provide direct care, treatment and protection services in five UK centres. We engage in activism in order to bring the plight of torture survivors to light and carry out research that underpins our policy and advocacy work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£9,887,078
Donations and legacies | £8.90m | |
Charitable activities | £439.22k | |
Other trading activities | £473.36k | |
Investments | £74.93k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£12,057,079
Raising funds | £4.07m | |
Charitable activities | £7.99m | |
Other | £0 |
£9,139 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £257,307 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.07m | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.99m |
People

175 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
123 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
- Scotland
Governance
- FREEDOM FROM TORTURE (Working name)
- MEDICAL FOUNDATION (Working name)
- MEDICAL FOUNDATION CARING FOR VICTIMS OF TORTURE (Working name)
- MEDICAL FOUNDATION FOR THE CARE OF VICTIMS OF TORTURE (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Lois SAYER | Chair | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Shehara Natalie SAMARASINGHE | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Timothy Stuart GUY | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Orla FEE | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Angela CLUFF | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
John Patrick Dunford | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
PHILOMENE UWAMALIYA | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||
BRIAN GARETH DUNLOP | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
MAHESH WICKRAMASINGHE | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
RASHA OBAID | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
DR FIONA GOUDIE | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.99m | £12.81m | £10.31m | £11.93m | £9.89m | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.74m | £10.15m | £10.42m | £11.95m | £12.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £178.41k | £110.45k | £174.41k | £325.04k | £257.31k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £8.67m | £11.42m | £9.41m | £11.20m | £8.90m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £400.74k | £367.37k | £444.40k | £193.91k | £473.36k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £900.82k | £998.15k | £457.52k | £526.24k | £439.22k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £23.28k | £23.68k | £5.48k | £13.25k | £74.93k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.39m | £4.09m | £3.04m | £4.54m | £2.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.95m | £7.07m | £6.99m | £7.59m | £7.99m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.79m | £3.08m | £3.44m | £4.35m | £4.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £41.35k | £36.81k | £36.24k | £32.30k | £29.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.49m | £4.34m | £4.38m | £4.16m | £4.08m | |
|
Long-term investments | £17.17k | £14.20k | £17.09k | £14.34k | £23.48k | |
|
Other assets | £5.51m | £8.34m | £8.04m | £8.54m | £6.28m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.05m | £1.06m | £906.95k | £1.20m | £1.03m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH JUNE 1989 AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 5TH DECEMBER 1989, 25TH JUNE 1990, 8TH APRIL 1998 AND 2007 (OSCR AMENDMENT) AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 DEC 2014 AS AMENDED ON 24 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 MAY 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: - 3.1.1 TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION FOR PERSONS, AND MEMBERS OF THEIR FAMILIES, WHO HAVE BEEN TORTURED OR WHO HAVE BEEN TRAUMATISED BY OBSERVING TORTURE OR RELATED VIOLENCE ON OTHERS CLOSE TO THEM IN RELATIONSHIP OR PROXIMITY, PARTICULARLY AT A YOUNG AGE, IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, AND WHO, AS SURVIVORS OF TORTURE, ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED; 3.1.2 TO EDUCATE, TRAIN AND SUPERVISE LEGAL, MEDICAL AND OTHER PROFESSIONALS AND PERSONS WHO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO SURVIVORS OF TORTURE; 3.1.3 TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) AND THE EUROPEAN CONVENTION ON HUMAN RIGHTS, THE REFUGEE CONVENTION AND THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION AGAINST TORTURE (THE “CONVENTIONS”) BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (I) PROMOTING THE PROTECTION OF AND REDRESS FOR SURVIVORS OF TORTURE BY PROVIDING LEGAL AND WELFARE ADVICE, MEDICO-LEGAL REPORTS, RELIEF AND FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE; (II) RAISING AWARENESS BOTH IN THE UK AND ABROAD OF INCIDENTS AND PATTERNS OF TORTURE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; (III) RAISING AWARENESS BOTH IN THE UK AND ABROAD OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES RELATING TO THE OBLIGATIONS ON STATES UNDER THE CONVENTIONS TO PREVENT AND PROHIBIT TORTURE, PUNISH THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR ACTS OF TORTURE, PROVIDE REMEDIES TO SURVIVORS OF TORTURE AND NEVER TO EXPEL, RETURN OR EXTRADITE A PERSON TO ANOTHER STATE WHERE THERE ARE SUBSTANTIAL GROUNDS FOR BELIEVING THERE IS A DANGER THEY WILL BE SUBJECTED TO TORTURE; (IV) CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW AND ENSURING THAT GOVERNMENTS FULFIL THEIR HUMAN RIGHTS OBLIGATIONS RELATING TO TORTURE AND TORTURE SURVIVORS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
111 ISLEDON ROAD
LONDON
N7 7JW
- Phone:
- 02076977823
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window