YOUTH 2000 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth 2000 is a catholic youth initiative that organises both in person and online weekend retreats of prayer, events and prayer groups as well as training and formation for young adults, primarily between the ages of 18-24, although all our retreats are open to all between the ages of 16 and 35 years old. Subsidised places are available to those who would otherwise be unable to attend.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 September 1990: Standard registration
- YOUTH 2000 (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Francis Anthony Toone | Chair | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christiana Ugowe | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Fletcher | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iona Robinson | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Finn | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Hayward | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Downie | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER PURSLOW | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £301.38k | £237.92k | £197.49k | £249.32k | £241.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £383.76k | £141.85k | £197.14k | £240.27k | £217.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH APRIL 1990
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND OF RELIGIOUS TEACHINGS AND BELIEFS IN THE PERIOD LEADING UP TO THE SECOND MILLENNIUM OF CHRIST'S BIRTH AND BEYOND BY THE PROMOTION OF SPIRITUAL TEACHING AMONG MANKIND AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 408
Leeds
LS26 1HN
- Phone:
- 07393738198
- Email:
- info@youth2000.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window