Financial history THE ROYAL NATIONAL COLLEGE FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 1000388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £5.64m £5.62m £7.76m £7.58m £7.59m
Total expenditure £5.64m £5.52m £6.24m £6.97m £7.26m
Income from government contracts £4.28m £4.54m £6.03m £6.32m £6.52m
Income from government grants £179.00k £244.00k £180.00k £146.00k £183.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £448.00k £507.00k £451.06k £474.00k £256.00k
Income - Other trading activities £392.00k £264.00k £414.00k £455.00k £533.00k
Income - Charitable activities £4.58m £4.82m £6.32m £6.63m £6.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £196.00k £20.00k £997 £23.00k £70.00k
Income - Other £24.00k £12.00k £579.37k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £76.00k £121.00k £45.64k £67.00k £61.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.15m £5.14m £5.73m £6.44m £6.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £493.00k £376.00k £508.00k £530.00k £512.00k
Expenditure - Governance £29.00k £30.00k £46.00k £39.00k £49.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0