THE ROYAL NATIONAL COLLEGE FOR THE BLIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Residential Specialist College ,promoting the independence and potential of people who are blind or partially sighted ages 16 and over.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£7,588,000
Donations and legacies | £256.00k | |
Charitable activities | £6.73m | |
Other trading activities | £533.00k | |
Investments | £70.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,262,000
Raising funds | £512.00k | |
Charitable activities | £6.75m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £6,523,000 from 67 government contract(s) and £183,000 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £512.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.75m | |
Retained for future use | £326.00k |
People

153 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
54 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 20 September 1990: Standard registration
- R N C (Working name)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew David Powell | Trustee | 11 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thomas Gebbie | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Louise Bryson | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Miles | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Barnes | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Penny | Trustee | 13 July 2018 |
|
|||||
LUCY PROCTOR | Trustee | 31 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
KERRY ANN DIAMOND | Trustee | 13 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Simon Hairsnape | Trustee | 13 October 2017 |
|
|||||
JEREMY CLARKE-MORRIS | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN BREW | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Flynn | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.64m | £5.62m | £7.76m | £7.58m | £7.59m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.64m | £5.52m | £6.24m | £6.97m | £7.26m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £4.28m | £4.54m | £6.03m | £6.32m | £6.52m | |
|
Income from government grants | £179.00k | £244.00k | £180.00k | £146.00k | £183.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £448.00k | £507.00k | £451.06k | £474.00k | £256.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £392.00k | £264.00k | £414.00k | £455.00k | £533.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.58m | £4.82m | £6.32m | £6.63m | £6.73m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £196.00k | £20.00k | £997 | £23.00k | £70.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £24.00k | £12.00k | £579.37k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £76.00k | £121.00k | £45.64k | £67.00k | £61.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.15m | £5.14m | £5.73m | £6.44m | £6.75m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £493.00k | £376.00k | £508.00k | £530.00k | £512.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £29.00k | £30.00k | £46.00k | £39.00k | £49.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.95m | £13.13m | £13.06m | £13.18m | £13.00m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.03m | £641.00k | £350.00k | £350.00k | £350.00k | |
|
Other assets | £1.22m | £868.00k | £1.98m | £2.10m | £2.26m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£3.36m | -£2.57m | -£1.37m | -£2.35m | -£2.97m | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.40m | £3.01m | £2.55m | £2.51m | £2.37m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD APRIL 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 JUNE 1993, AMENDED 15 OCTOBER 1998 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 DECEMBER 2009 REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 DECEMBER 2009 as amended on 10 Apr 2015 as amended on 25 Apr 2017 as amended on 15 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE BLIND OR VISUALLY IMPAIRED AND FOR SUCH OTHER PEOPLE AS THE GOVERNORS MAY DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME ("BENEFICIARIES").
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O THE CLERK
ROYAL NATIONAL COLLEGE FOR THE
BLIND
VENNS LANE
HEREFORD
HR1 1DT
- Phone:
- 01432265725
- Email:
- info@rnc.ac.uk
- Website:
-
rnc.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window