THE WILDLIFE TRUST FOR BEDFORDSHIRE CAMBRIDGESHIRE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conservation and enhancement of wildlife habitats and biodiversity throughoput Bedfordshire, Cambridgeshire and Northamptonshire and enhancing everyone's enjoyment and understanding of wildlife.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£6,888,241
Donations and legacies | £2.16m | |
Charitable activities | £4.64m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £88.12k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,081,234
Raising funds | £1.27m | |
Charitable activities | £5.82m | |
Other | £0 |
£235,219 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £489,751 from 64 government contract(s) and £96,566 from 7 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.27m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.82m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.27m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.82m | |
Retained for future use | £42.23k |
People

137 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
1760 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bedford
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
- Northamptonshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 28 September 1990: Standard registration
- "THE WILDLIFE TRUST" (Working name)
- THE WILDLIFE TRUST BCNP (Working name)
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND CAMBRIDGESHIRE WILDLIFE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE WILDLIFE TRUST FOR BEDFORDSHIRE CAMBRIDGESHIRE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND PETERBOROUGH (Previous name)
- THE WILDLIFE TRUST FOR BEDFORDSHIRE, CAMBRIDGESHIRE, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND PETERBOROUGH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Hilary Mary Allison | Chair | 19 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Reiner Schulte | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
James John Paul Marsh | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Michael Krause | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Kimberley Coleman | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Brown | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Vyse | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Gordon William Day | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Samways | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Philip Hayes | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Audrey Davis | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Hannah Mary Bartram | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Samuel Fraser Brockington | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.77m | £5.40m | £7.14m | £10.53m | £6.89m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.23m | £5.03m | £5.84m | £7.19m | £7.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £677.34k | £266.94k | £242.39k | £532.59k | £489.75k | |
|
Income from government grants | £242.05k | £648.09k | £269.42k | £175.92k | £96.57k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.54m | £1.91m | £3.94m | £2.56m | £2.16m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.22m | £3.42m | £3.13m | £7.90m | £4.64m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.72k | £63.61k | £75.06k | £77.20k | £88.12k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.88m | £163.44k | £2.16m | £536.65k | £134.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.25m | £4.33m | £4.76m | £5.90m | £5.82m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £985.11k | £702.19k | £1.08m | £1.28m | £1.27m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £72.70k | £73.93k | £75.06k | £39.82k | £43.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £1.91k | £1.27k | £1.03k | £747 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £18.26m | £18.28m | £18.45m | £23.15m | £22.87m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £500.00k | |
|
Other assets | £6.30m | £7.40m | £8.33m | £6.83m | £6.95m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£96.86k | -£62.32k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £957.47k | £1.39m | £1.13m | £1.12m | £1.41m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/08/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/11/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/05/1995 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/10/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/10/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/10/2011 as amended on 08 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO UNDERTAKE, PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE CREATION, CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF WILDLIFE AND ITS HABITATS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE, CARRY ON AND ENCOURAGE STUDY AND RESEARCH FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE IN THE NATURAL SCIENCES, AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF AND TO MAKE GRANTS OR DONATIONS FOR SUCH PURPOSES, AND TO INFORM AND INVOLVE PEOPLE ON MATTERS RELATING TO WILDLIFE AND ITS HABITATS THROUGH OFFERING ADVICE AND SHARING KNOWLEDGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE BEDFORDSHIRE CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Wildlife Trust
The Manor House
Broad Street
Great Cambourne
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 6DH
- Phone:
- 01954713525
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window