BRITISH RECORD INDUSTRY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded by the recorded music industry in 1989, The BRIT Trust works to promote diversity and inclusion in the UK by empowering people of all backgrounds through music and the creative arts. The BRIT Trust makes donations to support education and wellbeing activities that inspire people to realise their full potential and life chances, whatever their abilities, ethnicity, gender and sexuality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,819,594
Donations and legacies | £1.49m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £326.99k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,037,602
Raising funds | £54.69k | |
Charitable activities | £982.91k | |
Other | £0 |
£916,850 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £54.69k | |
Charitable expenditure | £982.91k | |
Retained for future use | £781.99k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £54.69k | |
Charitable expenditure | £982.91k | |
Retained for future use | £1.70m |
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 September 1990: Standard registration
- BRIT TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Joanna Louise Twist | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Daniel Curr McQueen Chalmers | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Ruth Carsen | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
YolanDa Faye Brown | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Kwame Kwaten | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mulika Sannie | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Dollimore | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Paul Jeffrey Burger OBE | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Henry Semmence | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
RITA BROE | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Angela Claire Mary Watts | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RICHARD SHARPE | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Peter Munns | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
TONY WADSWORTH CBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.86m | £1.69m | £414.20k | £1.12m | £1.82m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.23m | £1.18m | £1.14m | £1.15m | £1.04m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.44m | £1.38m | N/A | £821.37k | £1.49m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £418.37k | £306.71k | N/A | £296.70k | £326.99k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.15m | £1.12m | N/A | £1.09m | £982.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £75.88k | £51.94k | N/A | £57.19k | £54.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.92k | £21.28k | N/A | £17.28k | £21.72k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.14m | £1.10m | N/A | £1.06m | £958.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £51.86k | £51.94k | N/A | £57.19k | £54.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £888 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1 | £0 | N/A | £1 | £1 | |
|
Long-term investments | £13.38m | £13.43m | N/A | £13.00m | £13.87m | |
|
Other assets | £1.19m | £978.95k | N/A | £136.71k | £959.34k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.26m | £1.80m | N/A | £1.85m | £1.85m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/03/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/09/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUST MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 4
Tileyard Studios
Tileyard Road
LONDON
N7 9AH
- Phone:
- 02078031300
- Email:
- brittrust@bpi.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window