Financial history THE ZEBRA FOUNDATION FOR VETERINARY ZOOLOGICAL EDUCATION

Charity Number: 1000452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £3.47k £8.98k £7.51k £16.70k £10
Total expenditure £10.47k £11.14k £7.65k £6.61k £13.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A