THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF HARVARD BUSINESS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1000531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising scholarship funds for Fulbright tuition scholarships to Harvard Business School; promote the education of persons studying at HBS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 September 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Mulcahy Trustee 03 July 2024
SUFFOLK COUNTY FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Christine Fairchild Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Geoffrey Gareth Jones Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Pawan Dhir Trustee 24 January 2023
THE BRILLIANT CLUB
Received: On time
James Ruane Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Lilit Davoyan Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Meredith Pierce Hunter Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Lucy Shaw Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Philippa Lamb Trustee 05 August 2019
None on record
Gulshan Batool Trustee 03 June 2019
None on record
Christopher Stuart Benson Trustee 03 June 2019
None on record
CHARLES LAZAREVIC Trustee 28 April 2005
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £219.51k £569.42k £320.74k £119.76k £1.37m
Total expenditure £326.70k £234.01k £484.01k £133.16k £1.54m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £529.75k N/A N/A £1.31m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £39.68k N/A N/A £55.10k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £1.23m
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £218.92k N/A N/A £1.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £15.08k N/A N/A £19.07k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £13.73k N/A N/A £26.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £189.03k N/A N/A £1.27m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £15.08k N/A N/A £19.07k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Long-term investments N/A £2.36m N/A N/A £2.84m
Other assets N/A £482.69k N/A N/A £49.89k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A £5.68k N/A N/A £98.84k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 15 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St James House
Vicar Lane
Sheffield
S1 2EX
Phone:
020 7025 1611