THE PREHISTORIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The presentation of lectures to the public, organisation of conferences and day schools, organisation of field trips and study tours, making grants to individuals, annual publication of the Proceedings of the Prehistoric Society, publication of a newsletter three times a year and making representations to government and other organisations about the protection of prehistoric sites.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 October 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Adelle Ann Bricking | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Oliver Philip Davis | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Jessica Sarah Bates | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr George Arthur Prew | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Robert Tyldesley Hosfield | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Lauren Wexler | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Julia Frieman | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Meredith Jane Iris Laing | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lisa-Elen Meyering | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rupert Andrew Housley | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Elaine Pope | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Felicity Amelia McDowall | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Linda Mary Hurcombe | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR JULIE PATRICIA GARDINER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.58k | £58.45k | £66.69k | £63.91k | £69.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.50k | £58.74k | £61.93k | £44.54k | £102.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH AUGUST 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE INTEREST IN PREHISTORY IN ALL ITS BRANCHES AND ALLIED SUBJECTS AND TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF THE ARCHAEOLOGICAL HERITAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON
INSTITUTE OF ARCHAEOLOGY
31-34 GORDON SQUARE
LONDON
WC1H 0PY
- Phone:
- 02073238579
- Email:
- prehistoric@ucl.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window