THE SOUTHWELL MINSTER CHOIR ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Association shall be the study and practice of choral music, in particular church music in order to foster the public knowledge and appreciation of such music by means of public performance and to promote the development of the Choir of Southwell Minster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 October 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev RICHARD FRITH | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MICHAEL NICHOLAS ALLSOPP | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
LAURENCE CLIFFORD CUNNINGTON | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ANTHONY PROVOST | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL NORMAN DAVIDSON | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL DAVID RUPERT SNEATH | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH HELEN JOHNSON | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|||||
ADRIENNE PAULINE PATTERSON | Trustee | 24 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.47k | £28.98k | £26.96k | £27.56k | £49.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.32k | £6.87k | £24.53k | £31.91k | £73.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST JULY 1989 AS AMENDED 20TH JULY 1990,AS AMENDED 2OTH JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR CHURCH MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE AND TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CHOIR OF SOUTHWELL MINSTER
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 EASTHORPE
SOUTHWELL
NG25 0HY
- Phone:
- 07790910298
- Email:
- laurence1999@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window