CORNWALL DEAF CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Deaf Centre for Deaf/Hard of Hearing adults and children and their families. We support all deaf/hard of hearing. The Centre offers regular social evenings and events, BSL classes, an Audiology Clinic, Lip Reading Classes, Youth Group, Children's Club, Deaf Church Group. We are the only Centre for the deaf/hard of hearing in Cornwall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

13 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 05 November 1990: Standard registration
- 31 January 2025: Funds received from 1182719 CAMBORNE DAY CENTRE
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terence Spivey Fundraiser | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Toby Clemence | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Mulligan | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Demelza Rouncefield | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Lear | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mulligan | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Mace-Butler | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clive Thomas | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Jones | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Burstow | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Curd | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE GOLDIE | Trustee | 03 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.34k | £19.97k | £23.98k | £6.08k | £14.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.97k | £24.44k | £28.83k | £19.60k | £19.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD SEPTEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY RESIDENT IN CORNWALL WHO ARE WHOLLY OR PARTIALLY DEAF OR WHO HAVE OTHER PROBLEMS WITH THEIR HEARING IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW OR SHALL HEREAFTER BE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE IN LAW
Area of benefit
CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Brunton Road
Pool
Redruth
TR15 3SL
- Phone:
- 01209613829
- Email:
- secretary.cdc@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window