Financial history THE GRANGE PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1000774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £206.37k £228.14k £194.73k £200.48k £303.91k
Total expenditure £183.80k £191.73k £176.28k £217.16k £270.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £178.86k £196.83k £158.27k £154.30k £267.47k