THE CAMBRIDGE PROJECT FOR THE BOOK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research, either directly undertaken or sponsored by the Trust, into the History of the Book.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 November 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Adrian Patrick Antony Kent | Chair |
|
||||||
ELSA MEYLAND-SMITH | Trustee | 07 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROF LESLIE HOWSAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS J W MONEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIRGINIA CRUM-JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER DE HAMEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF RICHARD MCCABE FBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr STELLA PANAYOTOVA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDNA MURPHY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.65k | £18.00k | £2.50k | £4.50k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.57k | £24.69k | £3.38k | £4.96k | £2.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13TH SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE BIBLIOGRAPHICAL STUDIES AND BOOK CONSERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAGDALENE COLLEGE
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0AG
- Phone:
- 01223332100
- Email:
- APHILLIPS.CPBT@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window