THE FOUNDATION FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation for Young Musicians exists to support and secure the future of London's Centre for Young Musicians. The Centre for Young Musicians provides music tuition and courses for London schoolchildren in programmes that range from beginner level instrumental study to advanced training suitable for those aiming to study at conservatoire or university.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Warren-Green | Chair | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
HUBERT BEST | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY HARNIESS | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Lawson | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
LISIA BASSETT | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARCUS PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH JENKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.79k | £109.51k | £95.71k | £157.83k | £115.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £180.17k | £128.44k | £140.06k | £82.22k | £108.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.00k | £28.00k | £28.00k | £28.00k | £28.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 OCT 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
A) THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS REGISTERED ARE TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ART OF MUSIC WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG MUSICIANS, PUPILS WHO HAVE OR MAY DISCOVER MUSICAL GIFTS OR APTITUDE AND OTHER PERSONS LIKELY TO BENEFIT THEREFROM THE PRACTICE AND PROVISION OF MUSIC, MUSICAL STUDIES AND RESEARCH RELATING THERETO AND ANY OTHER MATTERS WHICH CAM BE ACHIEVED BY CHARITABLE MEANS FOR CHARITABLE OBJECTS RELATING TO THE CREATION ENCOURAGEMENT TEACHING AND PERFORMANCE OF MUSIC INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THE ACQUISITION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES INSTRUMENTS SCORES AND OTHER MEANS OF PERFORMANCE AND STUDY AND PLACES FOR SUCH PURPOSES AND THE RAISING AND PROVISION OF FUNDS THEREFORE AND FOR THOSE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CENTRE FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS OR ANY ORGANISATION SUCCEEDING TO OR CARRYING ON ITS BUSINESS WHICH THE DIRECTORS OF THE COMPANY CONSIDER IT PROPER TO ASSIST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MORLEY COLLEGE LTD
61 WESTMINSTER BRIDGE ROAD
LONDON
SE1 7HT
- Phone:
- 02079283844
- Email:
- fym@cym.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window