Governing document THE NATIONAL COUNCIL OF WOMEN OF GREAT BRITAIN

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 DEC 1951 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 OCT 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 OCT 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 SEP 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION REGARDING THE SOCIAL ECONOMIC AND LEGAL POSITION OF ALL IN SOCIETY B) TO PROMOTE THE EQUALITY OF WOMEN IN SOCIETY C) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.