THE ST HELENS HOUSING ASSOCIATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees make grants to social housing providers operating in the St Helens area for the benefit of tenants and residents, who are elderly and live in the St Helens area. The objective is assist in the provision of housing and associated benefits for such tenant and residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- St Helens
Governance
- 12 December 1990: Standard registration
- ST HELENS HOUSING ASSOCIATION TRUST REGISTERED CHARIT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MCKENNA | Chair |
|
||||||
Jackie Mafi | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Margaret Healey | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN LAWRENSON | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
LES GARNER | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
REGINALD WILLIAM ALLEN LANG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEVIN GILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.54k | £11.74k | £12.76k | £19.88k | £19.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.77k | £23.83k | £22.70k | £19.77k | £20.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 8 NOVEMBER 1996 AS FURTHER AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 30 JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE ELDERLY IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Pilkington Family Trust
Salisbury Street
off Chalon Way
St. Helens
Merseyside
WA10 1FY
- Phone:
- 01744742511
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window