NEWPORT {SHROPSHIRE} COTTAGE CARE CENTRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief care and assistance of persons irrespective of colour, race or creed suffering from any form of sickness or incapacity. The advancement of education and provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation for the benefit of the community in Newport, Shropshire and the surrounding neighbourhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £44,299 from 1 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 20 December 1990: Standard registration
- 23 August 2023: Funds received from 1019200 WELLINGTON COTTAGE CARE TRUST
- NEWPORT (SHROPSHIRE) COMMUNITY HOSPITAL TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- NEWPORT {SHROPSHIRE} COTTAGE HOSPITAL TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Robson | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Ian Leslie Mould | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Young | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Joyce Valerie Burke | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara GOUGH | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT LAIDLER | Trustee | 25 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANN BROTHERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DERRICK CLANCY | Trustee |
|
||||||
KEITH CHARLES NORTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr NICHOLAS JOHN TINDALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £373.10k | £262.56k | £366.62k | £372.34k | £437.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £347.46k | £253.83k | £333.78k | £387.30k | £418.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £30.75k | £10.72k | N/A | £33.67k | £44.30k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £157.32k | £38.62k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MAY 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 30 AUGUST 2005 (CHANGE OF NAME)
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF CARE AND ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY SICKNESS OR INCAPACITY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION .
Area of benefit
FORMERLY THE NEWPORT (SHROPSHIRE) URBAN DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BAYLEY HILLS
EDGMOND
NEWPORT
TF10 8JG
- Phone:
- 01952810684
- Email:
- info@newport-care.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window