THE DOVE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Dove Trust is a Christian charity for the relief of poverty, for education, and for the advancement of the Christian Good News world-wide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Egypt
- Hong Kong
- Ireland
- Kenya
- Namibia
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Russia
- South Africa
- Tanzania
Governance
- 20 December 1990: Standard registration
- 06 June 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 06 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1196369 FOUNDATION HOME
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.08k | £17.55k | £38.97k | £62.76k | £70.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.13k | £3.40k | £51.87k | £65.75k | £41.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGION 2) TO ADVANCE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION 3) TO PROMOTE EDUCATION OF PERSONS IN NEED AND HELP WITH THEIR HOUSING AND ACCOMMODATION NEEDS 4)TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window