CUMBRIA BIRD CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement for the public benefit of the study of wild birds and the preservation of their habitats in Cumbria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cumbria
Governance
- 08 January 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Hind | Chair | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Neille Poole | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thalia Sparke | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mason | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Evans | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Connor Fraser | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan King | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Douglas | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dunstan | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Lyn Mills | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mike Mills | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adam Moan | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAKE MANSON | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Howard | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.76k | £5.01k | £6.42k | £7.55k | £9.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.30k | £8.81k | £9.07k | £7.93k | £7.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE STUDY OF WILD BIRDS AND THE PRESERVATION OF THEIR HABITATS IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Coach House
Hampsfell Road
GRANGE-OVER-SANDS
Cumbria
LA11 6BG
- Phone:
- 07879815276
- Email:
- info@cumbriabirdclub.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window