NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exert influence on government policy through the voice of local voluntary and community organisations. Enable Local Infrastructure Organisations to have strong governance and management and to provide inclusive services that enable voluntary and community organisations to meet the needs of the communities they represent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,305 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 January 1991: Standard registration
- NACVA (Working name)
- NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ACTION (Working name)
- NAVCA (Working name)
- NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COUNCILS FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA MEADOWS | Chair | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Batul Dungarwalla | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Sally Rose Page | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Jeremy Garth Hodgkinson | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Jackie Rosenberg | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Kishor Patel | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Lisa Healings | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Joyce Christine Blythe | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Hannah Reid | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Jessica Sumner | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Kerrie Louise Fletcher | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £397.78k | £1.54m | £1.36m | £1.51m | £436.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £379.18k | £1.37m | £1.24m | £1.45m | £720.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £95.20k | £10.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £130.00k | £1.21m | £859.37k | N/A | £28.31k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £33.35k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.53m | £1.35m | £1.47m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £5.83k | £5.96k | £8.92k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.37m | £1.24m | £1.45m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £1.12k | £1.59k | £2.22k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £22.75k | £23.98k | £5.85k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £971.16k | £669.10k | £815.19k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £1.12k | £0 | £2.22k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JANUARY 1991, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 1992, 17 SEPTEMBER 1993, SEPTEMBER 1998, 8 SEPTEMBER 1999, 06 SEPTEMBER 2000, 12 SEPTEMBER 2003, 07 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 17/09/09 AND 15/10/14 as amended on 16 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN ENGLAND AND IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY,DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CIRCLE
33 ROCKINGHAM LANE
SHEFFIELD
S1 4FW
- Phone:
- 01142786636
- Email:
- navca@navca.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window