THE FORWARD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a range of services to support individuals, families and communities whose lives are impacted by drug dependency, alcohol and other substance misuse. The charity operates with challenging service users who have complex needs in the community and within the criminal justice system.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£39,912,000
Donations and legacies | £2.03m | |
Charitable activities | £37.55m | |
Other trading activities | £245.00k | |
Investments | £94.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£39,856,000
Raising funds | £71.00k | |
Charitable activities | £39.78m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £32,850,000 from 37 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £71.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £39.78m | |
Retained for future use | £56.00k |
People

717 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
153 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 10 |
£70k to £80k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- REHABILITATION FOR ADDICTED PRISONERS TRUST (Previous name)
- THE ADDICTIVE DISEASES TRUST (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONY ADAMS MBE | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
David Meredith | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Amelia Fitzalan Howard | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|||||||
Katherine Simpson Lloyd | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ivor St John McKay | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
McIntosh Steven Harvey | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Joyce Adu | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Priestley | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Lisa Bryer Villiers | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jamie Drummond-Smith | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
ANDREW WYLIE | Trustee | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dame Benita Refson | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Hon. Isabelle LAURENT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.30m | £21.38m | £34.47m | £32.87m | £39.91m | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.56m | £21.53m | £29.97m | £33.67m | £39.86m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £14.83m | £18.13m | £28.05m | £24.24m | £32.85m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.31m | £1.22m | £2.56m | £2.31m | £2.03m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £63.00k | £101.00k | £292.00k | £283.00k | £245.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £19.91m | £20.06m | £28.05m | £30.28m | £37.55m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £9.00k | £1.00k | £0 | £38.00k | £94.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £3.57m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £20.54m | £21.51m | £29.95m | £33.62m | £39.78m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £17.00k | £23.00k | £27.00k | £56.00k | £71.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £231.00k | £237.00k | £328.00k | £438.00k | £444.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £82.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.00k | £1.00k | £3.40m | £4.15m | £4.68m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | £2.00k | £2.00k | |
|
Other assets | £5.70m | £5.16m | £7.34m | £6.49m | £6.80m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.45m | £2.02m | £3.03m | £3.64m | £4.43m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 NOV 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 JUN 2017 as amended on 28 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
2. Objects The objects of the Charity are for the public benefit and particularly, but not exclusively, by working with persons suffering from alcoholism, addiction, offenders, ex-offenders, those at risk of offending, and marginalised groups in society: 2.1 to relieve poverty, sickness and distress amongst: 2.1.1 persons suffering from the effects of alcoholism, drug addiction or other forms of addiction or dependence to substances; 2.1.2 persons engaged in substance misuse; 2.1.3 persons suffering from other compulsive disorders and related mental illnesses; and 2.1.4 the families and dependants of such persons; including but not limited to by the provision of treatment, advice, support, information and counselling to such persons, and to assist in the rehabilitation and recovery of such persons; 2.2 to promote the health of such persons through the provision of medical or psycho-social interventions or other treatment; 2.3 to advance the education: 2.3.1 and training of any person in the care or treatment of such persons working in the field of alcoholism, drug addiction or other forms of addiction or dependence to substances, substance misuse, other compulsive disorders and related mental illnesses; and 2.3.2 of the public in all aspects of addiction problems, including alcohol and substance abuse; 2.4 to promote research into addiction, substance misuse, compulsive disorders and related mental illness, including their natures and causes, and physical, psychological and social consequences and methods of treatment, and into the care and treatment of persons who are suffering from the effects of alcoholism, drug addiction or other forms of addiction or dependence to substances, persons engaged in substance misuse, and persons suffering from other compulsive disorders and related mental illnesses and to disseminate all useful results of such research to the public; 2.5 to prevent addiction, substance misuse, compulsive disorders and related mental illness and provide for the after care of those recovering (or who have recovered) from them; 2.6 to promote the care, resettlement and rehabilitation of offenders, ex-offenders and those at risk of offending, and to support their families and dependants, in particular (but without limitation) by providing, promoting, supporting or organising the recruitment, employment, education and training of offenders, ex-offenders and those at risk of offending and to assist them in finding employment or self employment and accommodation and in rehabilitating themselves; 2.7 to promote the prevention of crime and social exclusion by supporting or carrying on either alone or in co-operation with any other body, authority or person any project of scheme and by providing money for such purposes whether by loan or otherwise; 2.8 to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the objective of improving the conditions of life for the general public; 2.9 to provide or assist in the provision of spiritual help and guidance for the beneficiaries identified in Articles 2.1.1 to 2.1.4 above.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.IN PRACTICE U.K. SPECIFICALLY GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 106
Edinburgh House
170 Kennington Lane
LONDON
SE11 5DP
- Phone:
- 02039815525
- Email:
- info@forwardtrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window