Financial history THE BETCHWORTH COMMUNITY ROOM TRUST

Charity number: 1001840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.03k £11.57k £1.01k £2.60k £10.83k
Total expenditure £3.89k £1.72k £1.78k £4.45k £14.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £300
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A £6.00k