Financial history THE OLD SCHOOL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1002154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.65k £4.31k £9.09k £13.52k £15.97k
Total expenditure £7.83k £7.93k £10.23k £11.79k £13.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A £5.24k